Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Ready, Robinson, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the day on which interest begins to accrue on certain taxpayer refunds of certain tax payments; requiring a tax collector to pay interest on certain taxpayer refunds beginning on the date of the overpayment if the overpayment is attributable to an error or a mistake of the State or a unit of the State government; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0260 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page