Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a publisher who offers to license an electronic literary product to the public to also offer to license the electronic literary product to public libraries in the State on reasonable terms that would enable public libraries to provide library users with access to the electronic literary product; authorizing the license terms authorizing public libraries to provide access to electronic literary products to include certain limitations; defining "electronic literary product"; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0518
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses - Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164235/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses - Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {125169/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses - Access
Senate 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {164235/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses - Access
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Ways and Means 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {125169/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Text - Chapter - Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
(   23-701, 23-702 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:05 PM
Click to return on the top page