Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore City Young Readers Program within the Division of Children and Youth of the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to mail free, high-quality books to certain children; establishing the Young Readers Matching Grant Program within the Division to provide matching grants to affiliated services to support the establishment and operation of certain book-gifting services; requiring the Deputy Director of the Division to administer the programs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0383
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {333022/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Ways and Means 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (123-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text - Chapter - Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Age
(   8-1401 through 8-1403 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page