Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Transformation of Manufacturing in Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters relating to the State's current and future workforce and emerging digital economy; requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022, respectively; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0658
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2021
Legislative Date
1/24/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {317078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533093/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {293229/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (38-94)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-38)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Klausmeier and Hershey)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Klausmeier and Hershey)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-27)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Senate 1/24/2021 1/24/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {317078/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {533093/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Floor Amendment {293229/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (38-94) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-38) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Klausmeier and Hershey) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Klausmeier and Hershey) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Motion Recede (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (106-27) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 House Recede 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text - Chapter - Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page