Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the court from ordering the appearance of an individual for an examination in aid of enforcement or ordering an individual to answer interrogatories in aid of execution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0349
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0848 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {353429/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Judiciary 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {333529/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:47 AM
Click to return on the top page