Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain county boards of education to collect and track certain data relating to pregnant, expecting, and parenting students and submit certain data to the Institute for Innovation and Implementation in the University of Maryland School of Social Work on or before July 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; requiring the Institute to document and analyze certain data and to use certain information to develop recommendations on legislation, regulations, and policy initiatives needed to address certain issues; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0439
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
(   4-138 )
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page