Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Reilly)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the prohibition against a surety insurer inquiring about specified information in connection with an application for a bail bond or an immigration bond.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0678
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Recommitted to Finance (Senator Reilly)
Proceedings
40
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Favorable 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 32
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 35
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 39
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable 40
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Recommitted to Finance (Senator Reilly) 40
(   27-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page