Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $17,620,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Calvert County and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1439
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Appropriations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page