Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Beidle, Brooks, Charles, Corderman, Elfreth, Gile, Hettleman, Lam, McKay, Rosapepe, Salling, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, West, Zucker, and Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully making a threat to harm an election official or an immediate family member of an election official because of the election official's role in administering the election process; and establishing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $2,500 or both.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0585
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {673923/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {703126/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-23)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {673923/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Floor Amendment {703126/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Judiciary 39AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {493128/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (113-23) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
(   16-904 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 4:05 PM
Click to return on the top page