Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2022, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program from including a frequency limitation on dental prophylaxis care or oral health exams that requires the dental prophylaxis care or oral health exams to be provided at an interval greater than 120 days within a plan year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0547
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2021
Legislative Date
1/24/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Senate 1/24/2021 1/24/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Returned Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:06 PM
Click to return on the top page