Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement Agency to adjust a certain reduction of a retiree's accidental or special disability retirement benefit to reflect any offset awarded to the retiree's employer by the Workers' Compensation Commission.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0863
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page