Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding Queen Anne's County to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings used for agritourism from certain building performance standards; and exempting a building used for agritourism in Queen Anne's County from a certain permit requirement under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0586
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {863529/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Floor Amendment {863529/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page