Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Guzzone, Carter, Beidle, McCray, Feldman, Eckardt, Augustine, Smith, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law establishing educational programs for juveniles in residential facilities under the State Department of Education; establishing the Juvenile Services Education Board in the Department of Juvenile Services; requiring the Board to oversee and approve all educational services to all juveniles who are in a residential facility beginning July 1, 2022; establishing the Juvenile Services Education Program; requiring the Board to appoint a Juvenile Services Education Program Superintendent; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0071
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-501 through 9-506, 9-601 through 9-606 )
Last Updated: 2/18/2021 5:19 PM
Click to return on the top page