Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain exception authorizing, under certain circumstances, a student who is a registered sex offender to enter onto real property used for public or nonpublic elementary or secondary education; authorizing a student who is a registered sex offender to receive an education in accordance with State law in a locale other than real property used for public or nonpublic education; requiring a county board of education and the State Board of Education to develop certain guidelines and model policies; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0048
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1052 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928379/1
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928379/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928379/1
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928379/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion to remove committee amendment (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {808170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {483520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (47-85)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {928379/1 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {928379/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Smith) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {928379/1 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {928379/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion to remove committee amendment (Senator Bailey) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Substitute Committee Amendment {808170/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Floor Amendment {483520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (47-85) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:26 PM
Click to return on the top page