Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Licenses, Certificates, and Registration - Immigrants
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a health occupations board from denying a license, certification, or registration to an immigrant if the individual meets all educational, training, or professional requirements; and requiring each health occupations board to require each applicant for a license to disclose the Social Security number or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number of the applicant and record the number on the application.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0533
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593321/1
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Occupations and Professions - Licenses, Certificates, and Registration - Immigrants
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {593321/1 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Favorable with Amendments {593321/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Licenses, Certificates, and Registration - Immigrants
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page