Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to procure or provide for electricity customers energy efficiency and conservation programs and services designed to achieve an annual incremental gross energy savings of at least 0.4% starting in 2023; requiring the Department to develop a plan to coordinate and leverage funding sources to support certain energy efficiency and other home upgrades and a plan to provide energy efficiency retrofits to all low-income households by 2030; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0108
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2022
Legislative Date
1/29/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-37)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Senate 1/29/2022 1/29/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543525/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Economic Matters 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (100-37) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-211,   7-211.1, 7-211.2 )
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:47 AM
Click to return on the top page