Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application of the offshore wind energy component of the renewable energy portfolio standard to apply only to distribution sales of electric companies; altering the manner in which an electric company may reflect and recover offshore wind renewable energy credit costs; altering certain compliance fees for shortfalls from the offshore wind energy component of the renewable energy portfolio standard; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Offshore Wind Renewable Energy Credits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2022
Legislative Date
1/29/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413624/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity - Offshore Wind Renewable Energy Credits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-39)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Electricity - Offshore Wind Renewable Energy Credits
Senate 1/29/2022 1/29/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {413624/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Offshore Wind Renewable Energy Credits
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Economic Matters 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-39) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Text - Chapter - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page