Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth (By Request - Anne Arundel County Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring 3% of the hotel tax revenue generated in the City of Annapolis to be distributed to a special fund to be used only to fund the Annapolis Art in Public Places Commission; requiring 3% of the hotel tax revenue generated in the City of Annapolis to be distributed to a certain fund to be used only for housing assistance payments; requiring the Commission to report annually on its use of the hotel tax revenue during the preceding fiscal year to the Mayor, the City Council, and certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0901
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {559734/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795861/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments {559734/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Ways and Means 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {795861/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Last Updated: 5/10/2021 9:45 AM
Click to return on the top page