Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsored by
Caroline County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a barbershop and beauty salon beer and wine license in Caroline County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Caroline County to issue the license to a holder of a certain barbershop or beauty salon permit; establishing a licensing fee of $100; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0362
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/29/2024 10:35 AM
Click to return on the top page