Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Transfer Platform - Established (Transfer With Success Act 2.0)
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Hester, Hershey, Ready, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each community college and public 4-year institutions of higher education that receive State funds to participate in a transfer platform established by the Maryland Higher Education Commission to facilitate the transfer of students from community colleges to 4-year institutions of higher education; requiring a nonpublic institution of higher education that receives State funds to participate in the transfer platform if the institution has a total of at least 50 students who have transferred from a community college; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0598
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Transfer Platform - Established (Transfer With Success Act 2.0)
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {953327/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Transfer Platform - Established (Transfer With Success Act 2.0)
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Appropriations 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page