Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Required Meeting
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain assistant State's Attorney, with knowledge of the case, to meet with a victim of sexually assaultive behavior, at the request of the victim, or the victim's representative, within 10 days after a decision to not file a charging document or to dismiss charges against an alleged suspect; requiring the assistant State's Attorney, at the meeting, to explain the justification for not filing a charging document or for dismissing the charges; and authorizing the meeting to be held in person, by phone, or by other means as requested.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Required Meeting
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page