Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Procurement - Bids and Contracts
Sponsored by
Senator McKay
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the minimum dollar amount of contracts for which the County Commissioners, or any employee of Garrett County, are required to advertise for bids from $25,000 to $50,000; exempting certain contracts for professional services from a requirement to advertise for bids; and authorizing contracts for professional services required to be licensed by the State to be solicited by written bids.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0907
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County - Procurement - Bids and Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Garrett County - Procurement - Bids and Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Garrett County - Procurement - Bids and Contracts
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Garrett County - Procurement - Bids and Contracts
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page