Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - License Renewals and Continuing Education
Sponsored by
Senators Watson, Brooks, Carozza, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain processes regarding the expiration of certain licenses for real estate brokers, associate real estate brokers, and real estate salespersons; requiring that certain licenses expire on a staggered basis; modifying and setting certain time frames for certain processes regarding the expiration of certain licenses; authorizing the State Real Estate Commission to set a certain fee under certain circumstances; altering certain regulatory requirements for conducting certain continuing education courses; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0859
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - License Renewals and Continuing Education
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {493929/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - License Renewals and Continuing Education
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Economic Matters 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:45 AM
Click to return on the top page