Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Merging the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services; altering the duties and membership of the Procurement Improvement Council; requiring, by December 31, 2022, the Procurement Improvement Council to make recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly on strategies and enforcement mechanisms to improve compliance by entities required to publish certain notices; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0871
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564733/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {564733/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/6/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page