Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Prevention Services
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Sydnor, Smith, and Hettleman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the court to grant a recess or a continuance in certain landlord and tenant actions for certain purposes, including for the purpose of obtaining eviction prevention services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0691
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313722/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313722/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Prevention Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant and Wrongful Detainer Actions - Eviction Prevention Services
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {313722/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {313722/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Prevention Services
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Judiciary Environment and Transportation 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page