Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling an essential good or service during a state of emergency and for the 90 days following the end of the state of emergency for a price of 10% or more of the price charged prior to a state of emergency; and requiring the Secretary of State to establish an electronic notification system by which a person may register to receive certain information.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0800
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Unfavorable Report by Finance
(   14-1201 through 14-1204 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page