Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Climate Risk – Fiduciary Duties
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a fiduciary of the State Retirement and Pension System to consider certain climate risks on the System's assets; requiring a climate risk assessment to include a certain review of the System's investment portfolio to determine the level of climate risk across certain sectors and asset classes, identification of investment opportunities in certain energy sectors, a process for regular reassessment of certain impact of climate risk, and utilization of the best data and practices for climate risk analyses; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0740
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {433824/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-40)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 9:00 a.m.
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Climate Risk – Fiduciary Duties
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Floor Amendment {433824/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-30) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Climate Risk – Fiduciary Duties
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-40) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Climate Risk – Fiduciary Duties
Last Updated: 6/2/2022 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page