Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of law governing the reporting and investigation of workers' compensation insurance fraud claims apply to certain employers who participate in a governmental self-insurance group for workers compensation and to certain employers who self-insure for workers' compensation; providing that certain provisions of law governing fraudulent insurance acts that apply to insurers also apply to certain governmental self-insurance groups and certain employers under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1499
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {837077/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {837077/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Economic Matters 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   1-204, 27-402, 27-801, 27-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page