Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Universal Expansion
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standards of the State Free Feeding Program, beginning in fiscal year 2025, to require that if a school participates in the federal School Breakfast Program or the National School Lunch Program, then each student in the school must be offered a meal at no cost to the student; providing for the reimbursement rate at which the State shall pay county boards and participating nonpublic schools for the meals offered to students; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0696
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0557 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024, July 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Universal Expansion
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Last Updated: 2/16/2024 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page