Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Lowering from 70 to 65 years the minimum age that the owner of a motor vehicle must attain in order for the motor vehicle to be exempt from mandatory testing requirements; and increasing from 5,000 to 10,000 the maximum number of miles that a motor vehicle may be driven annually in order to be exempt from mandatory inspection and testing requirements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page