Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Materials for Individualized Education Program, Individualized Family Service Plan, and 504 Plan Meetings
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Feldman, Gallion, Guzzone, Hettleman, King, Waldstreicher, Augustine, Brooks, Carozza, Hester, Kagan, Simonaire, M. Washington, Watson, and Lewis Young
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a local school system to provide to parents at certain individualized education program, individualized family service plan, and 504 plan meetings for children with disabilities certain written informational materials regarding the Maryland ABLE Program: requiring the State Treasurer to develop informational materials about the Maryland ABLE Program that may be distributed electronically or by hand; and requiring the State Treasurer to provide informational materials to the State Board of Education and county boards.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0336
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Materials for Individualized Education Program Meetings
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/05/2024 2/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {923820/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 2/22/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Materials for Individualized Education Program, Individualized Family Service Plan, and 504 Plan Meetings
Senate 3/07/2024 2/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Ways and Means 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 9:01 AM
Click to return on the top page