Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program within the Department of Commerce; authorizing certain individuals and corporations to receive a grant equal to 25% of the qualified capital expenses incurred in connection with establishing new wineries or vineyards or completing capital improvements at existing wineries and vineyards; requiring the Governor each year to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $1,000,000 to be used for grants under the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1388
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223029/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text - Chapter - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
(   5-1901 through 5-1903 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page