Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Griffith, Jackson, King, McCray, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing certain theatrical production entities to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain costs incurred for certain theatrical productions within the State; making the credit refundable under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Commerce to administer the credit; and prohibiting the Secretary from issuing tax credit certificates for credit amounts in the aggregate totaling more than $5,000,000 in any fiscal year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0641
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0171 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193028/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-12)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {193028/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (118-12) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
(   10-754 )
Last Updated: 7/28/2022 9:28 AM
Click to return on the top page