Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Amendment – Beer and Wine Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of Maryland to establish that, on or after July 1, 2024, a retail grocery establishment in the State may obtain a license authorizing the retail grocery establishment to sell beer and wine to individuals who are at least 21 years old; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State at the next general election to be held in November, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0506
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0763 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Constitutional Amendment – Beer and Wine Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page