Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from willfully and maliciously killing, injuring, or interfering with the use of a certain service animal, or willfully and maliciously allowing a certain animal to kill, injure, or interfere with the use of a certain service animal; establishing penalties for a violation of certain provisions of the Act of imprisonment of up to 2 years or a fine of up to $2,500, or both; authorizing a court to order a certain defendant to pay certain restitution as a condition of sentencing; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {628675/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {203422/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
(   10-626 )
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:44 PM
Click to return on the top page