Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for up to $1,000 of donations of certain disposable diapers, certain hygiene products, and certain monetary gifts made by a taxpayer during the taxable year to certain qualified charitable entities; requiring the taxpayer to file certain information with the taxpayer's income tax return in order to claim the subtraction; requiring the Department of Human Services to adopt certain regulations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0711
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 5:06 PM
Click to return on the top page