Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Data – Collection and Distribution
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Judiciary to collect certain data pertaining to a warrant of restitution or a writ of possession issued in accordance with a certain judgment for possession of residential property; requiring the Judiciary to share eviction data with the Department of Housing and Community Development each month; requiring the Department to make eviction data available in a certain format to a State or local agency or an academic institution located in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0824
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Data – Collection and Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973522/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Data – Collection and Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Data – Collection and Distribution
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {973522/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Data – Collection and Distribution
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-133 )
Last Updated: 4/21/2022 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page