Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection – Consumer Electronic Equipment – Right to Repair
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring an original equipment manufacturer of consumer electronic equipment to make available, on fair and reasonable terms, certain documentation, parts, and tools to an independent repair provider or owner of consumer electronic equipment.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0412 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Consumer Protection – Consumer Electronic Equipment – Right to Repair
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   13-301,   14-4401 through 14-4404 )
Last Updated: 2/26/2022 9:28 AM
Click to return on the top page