Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law – Commission to Study the Ability of the Department of Juvenile Services to Provide Effective Social Services to Juvenile Offenders
Sponsored by
Senators West, Watson, and Carozza
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Study the Ability of the Department of Juvenile Services to Provide Effective Social Services to Juvenile Offenders; and requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2025.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law – Commission to Study the Ability of the Department of Juvenile Services to Provide Effective Social Services to Juvenile Offenders
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page