Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Queen Anne's County under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of Queen Anne's County's participation in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1056
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page