Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner – Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims – Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to enforce a certain provision of law providing that the provisions of § 15-1005 of the Insurance Article apply to a certain delivery system for specialty mental health services and administered by an administrative services organization.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0919
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827471/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Commissioner – Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims – Enforcement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {827471/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Commissioner – Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims – Enforcement
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page