Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Exemption for Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Limitation on Generating Capacity - Alteration
Sponsored by
Senator Brooks
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing, from 2 megawatts to 5 megawatts, the limitation on the generating capacity for certain community solar energy generating systems that are exempt from personal property taxes.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0361
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Exemption for Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Limitation on Generating Capacity - Alteration
Senate 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/13/2024 5:30 PM
Click to return on the top page