Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the boundaries for the county commissioner districts in Carroll County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Text - First - Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Reapportionment and Redistricting Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page