Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Juvenile Services – Report on Shootings (Department of Juvenile Services Transparency Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to report to the Commission on Juvenile Justice Reform and Emerging and Best Practices and the General Assembly, on or before December 1, 2024, and each December 1 thereafter, certain information regarding shootings of and by juveniles under the supervision of the Department and the actions the Department took after the shooting incidents, including the timeline of the actions.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {503223/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Department of Juvenile Services – Report on Shootings (Department of Juvenile Services Transparency Act of 2024)
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {503223/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Juvenile Services – Report on Shootings (Department of Juvenile Services Transparency Act of 2024)
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 6:22 PM
Click to return on the top page