Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Edward T. Conroy and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program - Expansion (Officer Keona Holley Public Safety Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Smith)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the Edward T. Conroy and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and the Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program to include certain postsecondary institutions outside the State as eligible institutions that may award scholarships under the programs.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543028/1
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543028/1
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543028/1
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Smith) Adopted (30-14)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543028/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {143220/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted (26-16)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Murder of a Police Officer (Officer Keona Holley Public Safety Act)
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543028/1 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543028/1 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Smith) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543028/1 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Smith) Adopted (30-14) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543028/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Floor Amendment {143220/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted (26-16) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Edward T. Conroy and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program - Expansion (Officer Keona Holley Public Safety Act)
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Smith) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page