Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Elfreth, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hettleman, Jackson, King, Lee, Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute $14,000,000 of certain abandoned property funds to the Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund for fiscal year 2024; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $14,000,000 from the Fund to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation for fiscal year 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0724
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {293121/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Judiciary 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
Text - Chapter - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 10:09 AM
Click to return on the top page