Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations
Sponsored by
Senator Charles
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the vendor to provide a purchaser under a land installment contract with the results of a title search for the property at or before the time the purchaser signs the contract; requiring the inclusion of certain notice, terms, and recitals in a land installment contract formed in the State; altering, from 40% to 20%, the percentage of the original cash price of a land installment contract that the purchaser must pay before the purchaser may demand a grant of the deed to the property to the purchaser; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0480
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0425 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page