Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $15,000 to $25,000 the maximum amount in controversy in a civil action in which a party may not demand a jury trial; providing for the construction and application of the Act; and making the Act contingent on the passage and ratification of a certain constitutional amendment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0899
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0551 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment and on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {422418/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Senate 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Judiciary 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {422418/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-35) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Text - Chapter - Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page