Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the authority of the Secretary of Natural Resources with respect to hiring, promoting, and transferring employees of the Natural Resources Police Force; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to include advertising that is targeted toward certain underrepresented racial and ethnic communities when advertising for or recruiting new Natural Resources police officers; requiring the Natural Resources Police Force to submit a report on a certain action plan to the General Assembly by December 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523724/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {523724/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Appropriations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-2) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page