Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources and local governing bodies to construct a communication board in each public playground by October 1, 2027; defining "communication board" as a device that displays photos, symbols, or illustrations to enable individuals with limited language skills to express themselves and communicate; and providing for the funding of communication board construction.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-2001 through 5-2003, 5-901   )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page